FL S7038 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7005
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7005
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amending a provision relating to an exemption from public records requirements for information held by an investigative agency pursuant to an investigation relating to an activity prohibited under the Florida RICO Act; removing the scheduled repeal of the exemption, etc.
Title
OGSR/Information Held by an Investigative Agency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 7005 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Substituted HB 7005 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/12/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/27/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Filed |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/14/20, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Criminal Justice |
Same As/Similar To
H7005 (Same As) 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-90