FL S7044 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7059 (Ch. 2019-34)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7059 (Ch. 2019-34)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amending provisions relating to an exemption from public records requirements for personal identifying information of an individual who has applied for a license to carry a concealed weapon or firearm through a tax collector appointed by the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to receive applications and fees; abrogating the scheduled repeal of the exemption, etc.
Title
OGSR/Concealed Carry License/Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7059 (Ch. 2019-34) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Substituted HB 7059 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/19 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 1 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/23/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/12/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/19/19, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Criminal Justice |
Same As/Similar To
H7059 (Same As) 2019-05-15 - Chapter No. 2019-34