FL S7044 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5007
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5007
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising required employer retirement contribution rates for each membership class and subclass of the Florida Retirement System; providing a declaration of important state interest, etc.
Title
State-administered Retirement Systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 5007 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Substituted HB 5007 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/12/20 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/06/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled |
2020-01-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/05/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Filed |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/21/20, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
Same As/Similar To
H5007 (Same As) 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-116
H5001 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-111
S2500 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5001
H5001 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-111
S2500 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5001