FL S7066 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain nonembryonic stem cell banks to pay specified fees, etc.
Title
Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#20 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Messages |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-05 | House | In Messages |
2020-03-05 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | CS by Rules read 1st time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/20 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building --Not Considered |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Filed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/20/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
S512 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages