FL S7072 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing certain Supreme Court justices to have an appropriate facility in their district of residence designated as their official headquarters; increasing the number of circuit judges in certain judicial circuits; revising the circumstances under which an offense of retail theft constitutes a felony of the second or third degree, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Justice System

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied on Calendar
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-05-02SenateRetained on Calendar
2019-05-01SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/19
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-18SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2019-04-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-11SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-09SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/09/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-03-21SenateIntroduced
2019-03-19SenateReferred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-03-18SenateFiled
2019-03-14SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Appropriations; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2019-03-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/14/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/07/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
2019-03-04SenateSubmitted for consideration by Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

H589 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
H937 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S328 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 337
S406 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
S1226 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
S1334 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
H337 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7125
H5011 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1012315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
26031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3736055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39447891Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009935Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409910Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489126Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53809Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53823Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5506305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627743Amended CodeSee Bill Text
634319Amended CodeSee Bill Text
634421Amended CodeSee Bill Text
636238Amended CodeSee Bill Text
642038Amended CodeSee Bill Text
705102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
812014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
812015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8120155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
812019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81214Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893138Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9518Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98511Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback