FL S7078 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138), CS/HB 7 (Ch. 2019-105)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Donated Dental Services Act"; establishing the Dental Student Loan Repayment Program to support dentists who practice in public health programs located in certain underserved areas; requiring a licensed hospital to provide specified information and data relating to patient safety and quality measures to a patient under certain circumstances or to any person upon request; revising the definition of the term "ambulatory surgical center", etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138), CS/HB 7 (Ch. 2019-105)
2019-04-26SenateSubstituted CS/HB 843
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-22SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2019-04-22SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-18SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2019-04-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-08SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-04SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 5 NAYS 4
2019-04-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/04/19, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-21SenateIntroduced
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-03-19SenateFiled
2019-03-18SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 2
2019-03-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/18/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-13SenateSubmitted for consideration by Health Policy

Same As/Similar To

S7080 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
H7 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Chapter No. 2019-105, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
H319 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
H813 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
H843 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-138, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7 (Ch. 2019-105)
H935 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance
H1035 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
S1520 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7 (Ch. 2019-105), CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
S1560 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance
H559 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
H25 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
H465 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
H1207 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
H1243 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
S434 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
S716 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
S882 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
S1126 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
S1540 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3814019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38140195Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951052Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3953025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409973Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4564501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
542336Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62427Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62742393Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6274303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7078
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7078/BillText/pb/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7078/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7078/BillText/c1/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7078/Amendment/374812/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7078/Amendment/141012/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7078/Amendment/281306/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7078/Amendment/919626/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7078/Amendment/682214/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7078/Amendment/636166/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7078/Amendment/424690/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7078/Amendment/215674/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7078/Amendment/969226/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7078/Amendment/405094/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7078/Amendment/646092/HTML

Bill Comments

feedback