FL S7080 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an exemption from public records requirements for certain information held by the Department of Health, the Board of Medicine, or the Board of Osteopathic Medicine pursuant to the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact; providing an exemption from public records requirements for recordings, minutes, and records generated during the closed portions of such meetings; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemptions; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records and Meetings/Interstate Medical Licensure Compact

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
2019-04-03SenateCS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
2019-04-03SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-02SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-02SenateCS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/02/19, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-21SenateIntroduced
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations
2019-03-19SenateFiled
2019-03-18SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/18/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-13SenateSubmitted for consideration by Health Policy

Same As/Similar To

S7078 (Related) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 843
H843 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4564502Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback