FL S7088 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring applicants seeking to participate or renew registration in the state hemp program to submit with their application a fee to be specified by rule of the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services; limiting the amount of the fee; authorizing the department to waive registration fees by rule, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fees/State Hemp Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-27SenateIntroduced
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-03-26SenateFiled
2019-03-25SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Agriculture; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2019-03-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/25/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-20SenateSubmitted for consideration by Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S1020 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-132
H1329 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
H333 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table
S1058 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
S1558 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581217Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback