FL S7098 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Chapter No. 2019-24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Chapter No. 2019-24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amending provisions relating to death benefits for law enforcement, correctional, and correctional probation officers and for firefighters, respectively; revising the payment amounts of death benefits; establishing a death benefit for emergency medical technicians and paramedics to conform to s. 31, Art. X of the State Constitution; specifying eligibility and payment amounts for such death benefits, etc.
Title
Death Benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#305 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Chapter No. 2019-24 | |
2019-05-10 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-05-06 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2019-04-30 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-26 | House | Received |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/19 |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | In Messages |
2019-04-25 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-22 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-04-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/16/19, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Filed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/02/19, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Building |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
Same As/Similar To
H7105 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7098 (Ch. 2019-24)
S1548 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7098 (Ch. 2019-24)
S1548 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7098 (Ch. 2019-24)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 191 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 1911 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 1912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
250 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
295 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
295 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |