GA HB10 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-27 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Motor Vehicles Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-27 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Motor Vehicles Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 11 of Chapter 6 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to miscellaneous provisions of the uniform rules of the road, so as to provide that only hands-free telephone calls shall be conducted by a driver of a motor vehicle; to provide for exceptions; to provide for penalties; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; only hands-free telephone calls shall be conducted by driver; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Rahn Mayo [D] | Rep. Margaret Kaiser [D] | Rep. Karla Drenner [D] | Rep. Earnest Williams [D] |
Rep. Keisha Waites [D] | Rep. Sheila Jones [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-01-26 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-15 | House | House Hopper |
2014-11-24 | House | House Prefiled |