GA HB1002 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to imposition, rate, computation of, and exemptions from income taxes, so as to add Georgia income tax paid by an individual to Georgia taxable net income to the extent such tax was deducted in determining federal taxable income; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax; add Georgia income tax paid by an individual to Georgia taxable net income to the extent such tax was deducted in determining federal taxable income
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-25 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-24 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57674 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/190754 |