GA HB1005 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL To be entitled an Act to authorize the governing authority of the City of Forsyth to levy an excise tax pursuant to subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A.; to provide procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Forsyth, City of; levy an excise tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #535 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House Vote #492 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House Vote #492 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-30 | Act 412 | |
2020-06-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-24 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-25 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-24 | House | House Hopper |