GA HB101 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 40 and Code Section 48-5-504.40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to motor vehicles and watercraft and all-terrain vehicles held in inventory for resale exempt from ad valorem taxation for limited period of time, respectively, so as to revise definitions relative to all-terrain vehicles; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ad valorem tax; all-terrain vehicles; revise definitions
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Ridley [R] | Rep. Penny Houston [R] | Rep. Clay Pirkle [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] |
Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #314 (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #315 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #152 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #315 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #152 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-26 | Act 61 | |
2019-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-05 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-30 | House | House Hopper |