GA HB1014 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 42 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to downtown development authorities, so as to remove a provision providing perpetual existence to such authorities; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local government; downtown development authorities; remove provision providing perpetual existence to such authorities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #603 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-25 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57732 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/190930 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57732#17650 |