GA HB1030 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 4 of Title 2 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Seed Development Commission, so as to change certain provisions relating to the Georgia Seed Development Commission and its membership; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Seed Development Commission; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Rep. Penny Houston [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] |
Rep. Dominic Lariccia [R] | Sen. Ellis Black [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #861 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #676 (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Vote #583 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #676 (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Vote #583 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-05-03 | Act 555 | |
2016-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-16 | House | House Hopper |