GA HB1033 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the State Court of Cobb County, approved March 26, 1964 (Ga. L. 1964, p. 3211), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 3, 2017 (Ga. L. 2017, p. 378), so as to change the salary of the executive assistant to the clerk of the State Court of Cobb County; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cobb County; State Court; change salary of the executive assistant to the clerk
Sponsors
Rep. Ginny Ehrhart [R] | Rep. Albert Reeves [R] | Rep. Teri Anulewicz [D] | Rep. David Wilkerson [D] |
Rep. John Carson [R] | Rep. Erick Allen [D] | Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #774 (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Vote #510 (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Vote #510 (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 333 | |
2020-06-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-27 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-26 | House | House Hopper |