GA HB1052 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - House Disagrees Senate Amend/Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - House Disagrees Senate Amend/Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act known as the "Metropolitan Atlanta Rapid Transit Authority Act of 1965," approved March 10, 1965 (Ga. L. 1965, p. 2243), as amended, so as to reconstitute the board of directors; to provide for staggered terms for board members; provide for a limit on re-appointment of board members; to provide for a method for nonparticipating counties to join the Authority; to prohibit the Authority from entering into certain transactions; to provide for a suspension of restrictions on the use of sales and use tax proceeds; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Metropolitan Atlanta Rapid Transit Authority Act of 1965; reconstitute board of directors
Sponsors
Rep. Harry Geisinger [R] | Rep. Mike Jacobs [R] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Rep. Lynne Riley [R] | Rep. Tom Taylor [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #878 - Agree Sen Sub As Am (Y: 87 N: 64 NV: 24 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #719 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Vote #652 - Passage (Y: 115 N: 55 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #719 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Vote #652 - Passage (Y: 115 N: 55 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | House Disagrees Senate Amend/Sub | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-07 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-29 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-17 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-16 | House First Readers |