GA HB1052 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 14 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to business corporations, so as to provide for benefit corporations; to provide for definitions; to provide for the application of the business corporation Code; to provide for naming; to provide for stock certificates; to provide for amendments and transactions; to provide for duties and limitations of liability of directors of benefit corporations; to provide for annual benefit reports; to change provisions relating to definitions for foreign corporation; to change provisions relating to the right to dissent; to change provisions relating to the corporate name of a foreign corporation; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Business corporations; provide for benefit corporations; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Tom Weldon [R] | Rep. Stacey Evans [D] |
Rep. Beth Beskin [R] | Rep. Stacey Abrams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-18 | House | House Hopper |