GA HB1052 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the board of commissioners of Whitfield County, approved February 21, 1964 (Ga. L. 1964, p. 2175), as amended, so as to provide for the election of certain members of the board of commissioners by district; to provide for related matters; to provide for a referendum; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Whitfield County; board of commissioners; provide for election by district
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #692 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Vote #731 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Vote #731 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-08 | Act 522 | |
2018-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-14 | House | House First Readers |
2018-03-12 | House | House Hopper |