GA HB1070 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 3 of Title 44 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to condominiums, so as to provide new insurance policy disclosure requirements for condominium associations and unit owners in the event of potential or actual claims filed against such policies; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Condominiums; new insurance policy disclosure requirements for condominium associations and unit owners in the event of potential or actual claims filed against such policies; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - House - House Vote #782 (Y: 162 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #756 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #580 (Y: 157 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-01 Effective Date
2020-07-29 Act 506
2020-07-29HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2020-06-30HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2020-06-26HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2020-06-25SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-06-25SenateSenate Third Read
2020-06-23SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-06-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-06-17SenateSenate Withdrawn & Recommitted
2020-03-13SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-03-12HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-03-12HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-03-04HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-03-03HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-03-02HouseHouse First Readers
2020-02-28HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback