GA HB1071 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 11 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to taxes on tobacco products, so as to change certain provisions relating to the excise tax on certain tobacco products; to provide for a definition; to establish the rate of tax on certain tobacco products; to establish the retail selling price before the addition of certain taxes; to provide for annual renewal of tobacco dealer license; to provide for exemptions from certain taxes; to authorize the collection and payment on the first taxable transaction; to change certain provisions regarding civil and criminal penalties; to amend Code Section 50-13-2 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions relative to administrative procedure, so as to revise a definition to include hearings related to tobacco within its meaning; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Excise tax; certain tobacco products; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #828 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 161 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #790 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #736 - Motion To Engross (Y: 34 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Vote #672 - Passage (Y: 161 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #790 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #736 - Motion To Engross (Y: 34 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Vote #672 - Passage (Y: 161 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-01 | Act 698 | |
2012-05-01 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-09 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Engrossed | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-07 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-28 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-21 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-17 | House First Readers |