GA HB1084 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 12 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to commissions and other agencies, so as to provide for the creation of the Georgia Endowment for Teaching Professionals to foster a public-private partnership for support of postsecondary teaching professionals in high demand courses, subjects, and disciplines; to provide for a board of trustees; to provide for the membership, appointment, terms, and filling of vacancies of the board of trustees; to provide for the creation, appointment, terms, filling of vacancies, duties, and responsibilities of an advisory committee to the board of trustees; to provide for the purposes of the endowment; to provide for the duties and responsibilities of the board of trustees; to provide for discontinuation of the endowment under certain circumstances; to provide for certain reports and audits; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State government; provide for the creation of the Georgia Endowment for Teaching Professionals
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Cheokas [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] |
Rep. Terry England [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #627 (Y: 158 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-03 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-02 | House | House Hopper |