GA HB1092 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 43-34-25 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to delegation of certain medical acts to advanced practice registered nurse, so as to authorize the delegation by a physician to an advanced practice registered nurse to order radiographic imaging tests in non-life-threatening situations; to revise definitions; to increase the number of advanced practice registered nurses with whom a delegating physician can enter into a nurse protocol agreement and supervise at one time; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Professions and businesses; authorize delegation by a physician to an advanced practice registered nurse to order radiographic imaging tests in non-life threatening situations
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Randy Nix [R] | Sen. Ricky Williams [R] | Rep. J Collins [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - House - House Vote #641 (Y: 114 N: 38 NV: 7 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-03 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-03 | House | House Hopper |