GA HB110 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 34-7-2 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to payment of employee wages by lawful money, checks, or credit transfer and selection of payment dates by employer, so as to provide for the payment of wages by check upon the discretion of the employer; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Labor and industrial relations; payment of wages by check upon the discretion of the employer; provide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-05 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-30 | House | House Hopper |