GA HB1101 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 9 of Title 34 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to workers' compensation, so as to provide for the publication of decisions of the board; to provide for the entry and execution of judgment upon final orders and decisions regarding the Self-insurers Guaranty Trust Fund; to modify the notification period for revocation of a certificate of self-insurance; to revise provisions relative to the Self-insurers Guaranty Trust Fund; to provide immunity from liability for members of the board of trustees of the Self-insurers Guaranty Trust Fund; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Workers' compensation; Self-insurers Guaranty Trust Fund; revise provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Coan [R] | Rep. Dee Dawkins-Haigler [D] | Rep. Billy Horne [R] | Sen. Ralph Hudgens [R] |
Rep. Pedro Marin [D] | Rep. Carlton Rogers [R] | Rep. Kip Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #715 - Passage (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-20 | Act 377 | |
2010-05-20 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-13 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-13 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-31 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-11 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-11 | House Third Readers | |
2010-02-17 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-08 | House Second Readers | |
2010-02-05 | House First Readers |