GA HB1104 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 11 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to juvenile proceedings, so as to provide for graduated sanctions and secure detention for children who violate the terms of their probation; to define terms; to provide for an administrative procedure for hearing alleged violations of probation; to change provisions relating to dispositions for delinquent children; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Juvenile proceedings; graduated sanctions and secure detention for probation violators; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Stacey Abrams [D] | Rep. Jim Cole [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Rep. Mike Glanton [D] |
Rep. Jimmy Pruett [R] | Rep. Matthew Ramsey [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #923 - Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #782 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #782 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-04 | Act 674 | |
2010-06-04 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-05 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-29 | House Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-27 | House Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-27 | House Insists | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Insists | |
2010-04-27 | House Disagrees Senate Amend/Sub | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-30 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-26 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-22 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-08 | House Second Readers | |
2010-02-05 | House First Readers |