GA HB1108 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Douglas County Board of Education, approved April 13, 1982 (Ga. L. 1982, p. 4786), as amended, particularly by an Act approved February 27, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 3717), so as to provide for compensation of members; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Douglas County; Board of Education; provide for compensation of members
Sponsors
Rep. Micah Gravley [R] | Rep. Kimberly Alexander [D] | Rep. LaDawn Jones [D] | Rep. Dustin Hightower [R] |
Rep. Sharon Beasley-Teague [D] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #680 (Y: 34 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #585 (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #586 (Y: 15 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - House - House Vote #714 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #585 (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #586 (Y: 15 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - House - House Vote #714 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-10 | Act 439 | |
2014-04-10 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-03-06 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-06 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-06 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-03-03 | House | House First Readers |
2014-03-03 | House | House Hopper |