GA HB1122 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-20 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-20 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 8 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to regional commissions, so as to revise provisions regarding the appointment of nonpublic members to the regional commission councils; to provide for executive committees for each regional commission council; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Regional commissions; appointment of nonpublic members to the councils; revise provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] |
Sen. Dean Burke [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #599 (Y: 168 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-05 | House | House Hopper |