GA HB1125 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 1 of Title 31 and Article 1 of Chapter 18 of Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relating to health and state employees' health insurance and benefit plans, respectively, so as to provide for information and screening coverage for individuals at high risk for breast cancer; to provide for a definition; to provide for identified and compiled information to be posted on the internet and distributed to physicians; to provide for coverage under the state health benefit plan for additional screening for individuals at high risk for breast cancer; to provide for related matters; to provide for a short title; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Lacee's Law; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Lynn Smith [R] |
Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] | Rep. Ginny Ehrhart [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #738 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #613 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #613 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-05 | Act 587 | |
2020-08-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-05 | House | House Hopper |