GA HB113 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to issuance, expiration, and renewal of drivers' licenses, so as to prohibit license and instruction permit holders under 18 years of age from using a stand-alone electronic device or wireless telecommunications device while operating a motor vehicle; to provide for exceptions; to provide for a civil penalty; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; prohibit license and instruction permit holders from using a stand-alone electronic device or wireless telecommunications device while driving
Sponsors
Rep. John Carson [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Dave Belton [R] |
Rep. Richard Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-13 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-02-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-05 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-30 | House | House Hopper |