GA HB1138 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to incorporate the town of Argyle, approved November 18, 1901 (Ga. L. 1901, p. 301), so as to provide for elections and procedures; to provide for oaths; to provide for qualifications of voters; to provide for a county sheriff; to provide for a town clerk; to provide for bonds; to provide for the powers and duties of the mayor and council; to provide for public works; to provide for a mayor's court; to provide for sanctions for violations of law; to provide for compensation of various officials; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Argyle, Town of; elections and procedures; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #719 (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Vote #649 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Vote #649 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 342 | |
2020-06-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-06-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-10 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-09 | House | House Hopper |