GA HB1169 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Shellman, approved April 19, 2000 (Ga. L. 2000, p. 4412), so as to revise provisions related to filling vacancies on the city council; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Shellman, City of; filling vacancies on the city council; revise provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #719 (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - House - House Vote #666 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - House - House Vote #666 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-30 | Act 427 | |
2020-06-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-06-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-06-15 | House | House First Readers |
2020-06-15 | House | House Hopper |