GA HB1173 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Bluffton, approved March 24, 1994 (Ga. L. 1994, p. 3786), so as to provide that the mayor can vote on the city council to provide a majority; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Bluffton, City of; mayor can vote to provide a majority on city council; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #719 (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - House - House Vote #666 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - House - House Vote #666 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-30 | Act 429 | |
2020-06-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-06-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-06-15 | House | House First Readers |
2020-06-15 | House | House Hopper |