GA HB118 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 10 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to obstruction of public administration and related offenses, so as to revise the offense of transmitting a false alarm; to provide for the offense of making an unlawful request for emergency service assistance; to provide for definitions; to provide for criminal penalties; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; transmitting a false alarm; revise offense
Sponsors
Rep. Marc Morris [R] | Rep. Wesley Cantrell [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] |
Rep. Micah Gravley [R] | Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #364 (Y: 143 N: 12 NV: 15 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #344 (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #177 (Y: 151 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #344 (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #177 (Y: 151 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-28 | Act 73 | |
2019-04-28 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-05 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-30 | House | House Hopper |