GA HB12 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 15 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to miscellaneous provisions under the "Quality Basic Education Act," so as to require every public school to post a sign containing the toll-free telephone number operated by the Division of Family and Children Services of the Department of Human Services to receive reports of child abuse or neglect; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide that no cause of action is created; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Quality Basic Education Act; post sign containing telephone number to receive reports of child abuse; require every public school
Sponsors
Sen. Ricky Williams [R] | Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] | Rep. Michael Wilensky [D] | Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] |
Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Becky Evans [D] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #338 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #145 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #145 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-02 | Act 129 | |
2019-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-05 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-30 | House | House Hopper |
2019-01-08 | House | House Prefiled |