GA HB1243 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act revising, superseding, and consolidating the laws relating to the governing authority of DeKalb County and creating a chairman and board of commissioners of said county, approved March 8, 1956 (Ga. L. 1956, p. 3237), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 9, 1981 (Ga. L. 1981, p. 4304), an Act approved March 20, 1990 (Ga. L. 1990, p. 3900), an Act approved April 13, 1992 (Ga. L. 1992, p. 6137), and an Act approved May 12, 2015 (Ga. L. 2015, p. 3811); to provide for related matters; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
DeKalb County; board of commissioners; change manner of appointment and terms of office of members
Sponsors
Rep. Viola Davis [D] | Rep. Billy Mitchell [D] | Rep. Renitta Shannon [D] | Rep. Bee Nguyen [D] |
Rep. Michele Henson [D] | Rep. Karla Drenner [D] | Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #774 (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #704 (Y: 155 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #704 (Y: 155 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-29 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-29 | Act 538 | |
2020-07-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-07-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-26 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-06-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-06-20 | House | House First Readers |
2020-06-20 | House | House Hopper |