GA HB1246 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Ware County Water and Sewer Authority, now known as the Satilla Regional Water and Sewer Authority, approved October 1, 2001 (Ga. L. 2001, Ex. Sess., p. 705), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 11, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 5337), so as to provide that all five board members are elected pursuant to the Act; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Satilla Regional Water and Sewer Authority; all five board members are elected pursuant to the Act; provide
Sponsors
Rep. James Burchett [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Steven Meeks [R] | Rep. Steven Sainz [R] |
Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #774 (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #704 (Y: 155 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #704 (Y: 155 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-30 | Act 444 | |
2020-06-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-06-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-06-22 | House | House First Readers |
2020-06-22 | House | House Hopper |