GA HB1247 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Warner Robins; to provide for construction and severability; to provide for related matters; to provide a specific repealer; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Warner Robins, City of; provide new charter

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #742 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #704 (Y: 155 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-29 Effective Date
2020-07-29 Act 540
2020-07-29HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2020-07-02HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2020-06-26HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2020-06-25SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-06-25SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-06-25SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-06-24HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2020-06-24HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-06-24HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2020-06-23HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-06-22HouseHouse First Readers
2020-06-22HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback