GA HB1248 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Cordele; to provide for definitions and construction; to provide for severability; to provide for related matters; to repeal a specific Act; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cordele, City of; provide new charter
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #774 (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #704 (Y: 155 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #704 (Y: 155 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-29 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-29 | Act 541 | |
2020-07-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-07-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-06-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-06-22 | House | House First Readers |
2020-06-22 | House | House Hopper |