GA HB1249 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize Henry County, Georgia, and each municipality located within Henry County, to exercise all redevelopment and other powers under Article IX, Section II, Paragraph VII(b) of the Georgia Constitution and Chapter 44 of Title 36 of the O.C.G.A., the "Redevelopment Powers Law," as amended; to provide for a referendum; to provide for effective dates; to provide for automatic repeal under certain circumstances; to provide for severability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Henry County; Redevelopment Powers Law; provide for a referendum
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Rep. Demetrius Douglas [D] | Rep. El-Mahdi Holly [D] | Rep. Karen Mathiak [R] |
Rep. David Knight [R] | Rep. Dale Rutledge [R] | Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #774 (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #704 (Y: 155 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #704 (Y: 155 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-30 | Act 445 | |
2020-06-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-06-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-06-22 | House | House First Readers |
2020-06-22 | House | House Hopper |