GA HB127 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance, so as to repeal certain obsolete provisions relative to nonprofit medical service corporations and nonprofit hospital service corporations; to amend Titles 31 and 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to health and public officers and employees, respectively, so as to revise provisions for purposes of conformity; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; nonprofit medical and hospital service corporations; revise provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Vote #164 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Vote #28 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-05-01 Act 52
2017-05-01HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-03HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-06SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-03-06SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-17SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-16SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-09SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-08HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-02-08HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-01HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-01-30HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-26HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-25HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback