GA HB127 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to authorize the assessment and collection of a technology fee by the Probate Court of Echols County, approved April 27, 2016 (Ga. L. 2016, p. 3845), so as to extend the time for collecting such fee; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Echols County; Probate Court; extend time for collecting technology fee

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #30 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Vote #22 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-02-15SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-11SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-08HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-02-08HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-08HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-07HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-06HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-05HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback