GA HB128 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 33 of the O.C.G.A., relating to authorization and general requirements for transaction of insurance, so as to provide that insurers do not have to notify the Georgia Composite Medical Board of agreements to settle medical malpractice claims against physicians when the settlement resulted in the low payment under a high/low agreement; to amend Code Section 43-34-8 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the authority of the Georgia Composite Medical Board to refuse license, certificate, or permit or issue discipline; to amend Code Section 43-34A-3 of the O.C.G.A., relating to physician profiles; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; insurers do not have to notify the Georgia Composite Medical Board of agreements to settle medical malpractice claims against physicians when the settlement resulted in the low payment under a high/low agreement; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] | Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] |
Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #222 (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House Vote #37 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House Vote #37 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 269 | |
2019-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-06 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-05 | House | House Hopper |