GA HB130 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the State Board of Education, so as to authorize the Georgia Foundation for Public Education to establish a nonprofit corporation to qualify as a public foundation; to provide for conditions; to provide for an annual report; to provide for a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Board of Education; authorize the Georgia Foundation for Public Education to establish a nonprofit corporation to qualify as a public foundation; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Nix [R] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] | Rep. Matthew Gambill [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] |
Rep. Mike Glanton [D] | Sen. Ellis Black [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #239 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Vote #50 (Y: 167 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Vote #50 (Y: 167 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-02 | Act 131 | |
2019-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-02-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-06 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-05 | House | House Hopper |