GA HB132 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the imposition, rate, and computation and exemptions from state income taxes, so as to permit affiliated entities to apply certain transferable tax credits against payroll withholding; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax; permit affiliated entities to apply certain transferable tax credits against payroll withholding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - House Vote #119 (Y: 156 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-06 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-05 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/54530 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/180279 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/54530#16668 |