GA HB1345 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for a short title, to amend Chapter 2 of Title 26 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to standards, labeling, and adulteration of food, so as to repeal provisions relating to kosher foods; to amend Part 2 of Article 15 of Chapter 1 of Title 10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the "Fair Business Practices Act of 1975," so as to provide for oversight by the administrator of kosher food; to provide for definitions; to provide for a kosher food disclosure statement; to provide for exceptions; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Kosher Food Consumer Protection Act; enact
Sponsors
Sen. Don Balfour [R] | Rep. Michele Henson [D] | Rep. Mike Jacobs [R] | Rep. Kevin Levitas [D] |
Sen. Francis Millar [R] | Rep. Joe Wilkinson [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #741 - Passage As Amended (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-20 | Act 372 | |
2010-05-20 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-21 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-26 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-24 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-18 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-11 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-10 | House First Readers |