GA HB16 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to education, so as to provide for in-state tuition at units of the University System of Georgia and branches of the Technical College System of Georgia for youth who are from foster care or homeless situations; to exclude foster care assistance from consideration as income for purposes of calculating financial aid; to provide for definitions; to provide a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Higher Education Access and Success for Homeless and Foster Youth Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Carl Gilliard [D] | Rep. Kim Schofield [D] | Rep. Patty Stinson [D] |
Rep. Sharon Beasley-Teague [D] | Rep. Sheila Nelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-28 | House | House Hopper |
2019-01-08 | House | House Prefiled |