GA HB164 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a homestead exemption from Jackson County School District ad valorem taxes for educational purposes in the amount of $10,000.00 of the assessed value of the homestead for certain residents of that school district who are senior citizens who have annual earned family incomes not exceeding $18,000.00, approved March 24, 1994 (Ga. L. 1994, p. 3758), as amended, so as to change the net income limitation for receiving such exemptions from $18,000.00 to $25,000.00, not including certain retirement income; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Jackson County; school district ad valorem tax; change net income limitation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #54 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Vote #29 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Vote #29 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-30 | Act 101 | |
2019-04-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-06 | House | House Hopper |