GA HB167 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-23 - Senate Transmitted House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-23 - Senate Transmitted House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 33-23-29 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to authority of agent to act as adjuster, nonresident adjusters, and reciprocal agreements, so as to allow employees of licensed property and casualty insurers to adjust residential property insurance claims of $1,000.00 or less without obtaining an adjuster license; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; employees of licensed property and casualty insurers to adjust residential property insurance claims of $1,000.00 or less without obtaining an adjuster license; allow
Sponsors
Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] | Rep. Noel Williams [R] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] |
Rep. Karen Mathiak [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #702 (Y: 24 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #703 (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Vote #59 (Y: 104 N: 60 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #703 (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Vote #59 (Y: 104 N: 60 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-06 | House | House Hopper |