GA HB168 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-8-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to exemptions from sales and use tax, so as to extend an exemption from sales and use tax for five additional years regarding the sale or use of tangible personal property to certain nonprofit health centers; to extend an exemption for five additional years with respect to certain nonprofit volunteer health clinics; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; tangible personal property to certain non-profit health centers; extend exemption for five additional years
Sponsors
Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] | Rep. Butch Parrish [R] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] |
Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] | Sen. Ellis Black [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #195 (Y: 33 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #197 (Y: 45 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #175 (Y: 164 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #197 (Y: 45 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #175 (Y: 164 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-10 | Act 316 | |
2019-05-10 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-06 | House | House Hopper |